Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property – Residential Rental Property Inspection – Remote Visual Inspection
Sponsored by
Delegate Henson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain local jurisdictions to adopt provisions for the remote visual inspection of certain residential rental property under certain circumstances; requiring a certain local provision to be calculated to achieve a remote visual inspection that is comparable to an on-site visual inspection, require inspections to be directed by a certain individual, require a certain verification, identify the aspects of a property that may be inspected remotely, and require, before any enforcement action, a certain on-site inspection; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {470018/1 Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-10)
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/13/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - Residential Rental Property Inspection - Remote Video Inspection
House 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {470018/1 Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Real Property - Residential Rental Property Inspection - Remote Video Inspection
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (122-10) 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2021 2/13/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 3/04/2021 Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:37 PM
Click to return on the top page