Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transfer With Success Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Solomon
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to establish certain procedures that require a public institution of higher education that denies the transfer of a credit or course to an enrolled student to report the denial to the student and the institution from which the student originates and submit to the Commission a report each year listing the denials and the reasons for the denials; and requiring the procedures to direct a certain institution to review a denial of the transfer of a credit or course.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0886
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1082 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transfer With Success Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {344869/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Transfer With Success Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Transfer With Success Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Transfer With Success Act
House 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {344869/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Transfer With Success Act
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Returned Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Text - Chapter - Transfer With Success Act
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:41 PM
Click to return on the top page