Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
Sponsored by
Delegates Fennell, D. Barnes, Crosby, and Howell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim the fourth Thursday in March as Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day; and requiring the proclamation to urge educational and cultural organizations to observe Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day through appropriate and informative programs and activities.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0005
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0586 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/16/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed 46-0
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
House 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
House 2/16/2022 2/16/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/16/2022 2/16/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Third Reading Passed 46-0 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Text - Chapter - General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:18 PM
Click to return on the top page