Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Dashain Day
Sponsored by
Delegates Bhandari, Barve, Chang, W. Fisher, Jackson, Lehman, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim October 5 as Dashain Day, a festival originating in Nepal that celebrates and symbolizes victory of good over evil.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0470
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Dashain Day
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/16/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Dashain Day
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-5)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Dashain Day
House 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
House 2/16/2022 2/16/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/16/2022 2/16/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Dashain Day
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (123-5) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:18 PM
Click to return on the top page