Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public-Private Partnerships and the Collection of Video Tolls
Sponsored by
Delegate Solomon
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Public-Private Partnership Oversight Review Board to review public-private partnership presolicitation reports and make certain recommendations; requiring a certain reporting agency to include in presolicitation reports for public-private partnerships with a total value that exceeds $500,000,000 presolicitation reports of certain contracts; requiring a reporting agency to submit a separate presolicitation report for each phase of a project that will develop in phases; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0361
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1424 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public-Private Partnerships - Process and Oversight
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2021
Legislative Date
2/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {190514/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public-Private Partnerships and the Collection of Video Tolls
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-39)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Text - First - Public-Private Partnerships - Process and Oversight
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/06/2021 2/06/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {190514/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public-Private Partnerships and the Collection of Video Tolls
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-39) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation 30AClick to view Recorded Media
(   10A-101, 10A-106, 10A-201, 10A-203, 10A-301, 10A-401 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:38 PM
Click to return on the top page