Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Contractual Employees - Paid Leave
Sponsored by
Delegates Hettleman, Cardin, and Stein
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of Budget and Management to adopt regulations providing for paid leave for State contractual employees whose unit is closed on a scheduled workday at the contractual employee's regular rate of pay.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Contractual Employees - Paid Leave
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Contractual Employees - Paid Leave
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page