Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Morgan State University and St. Mary's College of Maryland - Training Format
Sponsored by
Delegates Boyce and Embry
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a certain required sexual harassment prevention training for employees of Morgan State University and St. Mary's College of Maryland may consist of webinar, computer-based, or online training if the training includes a certain evaluative component.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {763228/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
4/03/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Morgan State University - Training Format
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Favorable with Amendments {763228/1 Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Morgan State University and St. Mary's College of Maryland - Training Format
House 2/29/2024 2/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2024 2/20/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2024 3/25/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 4/03/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page