Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Facilities - Health Services Cost Review Commission - User Fee Assessment
Sponsored by
Delegate Pendergrass
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 696
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the maximum amount of total user fees, from up to $16,000,000 to up to the greater of 0.1% of the immediately preceding fiscal year's budgeted, regulated, gross hospital revenue or the largest amount determined for a fiscal year during the immediately preceding 5 fiscal years, that may be assessed on hospitals and related institutions by the Health Services Cost Review Commission.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0917
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {323623/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-16)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 696
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Care Facilities - Health Services Cost Review Commission - User Fee Assessment
House 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {323623/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Care Facilities - Health Services Cost Review Commission - User Fee Assessment
House 3/10/2022 3/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Finance 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (31-16) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 696
Text - Chapter - Health Care Facilities - Health Services Cost Review Commission - User Fee Assessment
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:19 PM
Click to return on the top page