Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency
Sponsored by
Delegate C. Watson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 441
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the purpose of a certain clean energy loan program to include loans for water efficiency projects, environmental remediation projects intended to remove environmental or health hazards, and resiliency projects to increase the capacity of a property to withstand the effects of climate change; adding water efficiency projects and environmental remediation and resiliency projects to the items requiring eligibility requirements under a certain ordinance; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0319
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-21)
Proceedings
26AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614136/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Healey, Harrison and Wivell)
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
39AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
39AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Healey, Harrison and Wivell)
Proceedings
39AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
39AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hester, Kagan and Ellis)
Proceedings
39AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hester, Kagan and Ellis)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Conference Committee Report {443927/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-25)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Conference Committee Report {443927/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled -
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 441
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency
House 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (114-21) 26AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2021 3/30/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments {614136/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 35AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 House Requests Senate Recede 35AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Healey, Harrison and Wivell) 35AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 39AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 House Requests Senate Recede 39AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Healey, Harrison and Wivell) 39AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Senate Refuses Recede 39AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hester, Kagan and Ellis) 39AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Senate Refuses Recede 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hester, Kagan and Ellis) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Conference Committee Report {443927/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (107-25) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Conference Committee Report {443927/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled -
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 441
Text - Chapter - Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency
(   1-1101, 1-1102, 1-1103 through 1-1105 )
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:06 PM
Click to return on the top page