Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase
Sponsored by
Delegates Williams and Crutchfield
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing to $146,500 the maximum salary that the Board of Public Works may set for a clerk of a circuit court.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0074
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-31)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-3)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase
House 2/16/2022 2/16/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (106-31) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-3) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Text - Chapter - Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase
Last Updated: 6/2/2022 1:34 PM
Click to return on the top page