Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Shielding of Court Records
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Amprey, Bartlett, Chang, Charkoudian, Charles, Crutchfield, Cullison, Henson, Hill, Howell, Landis, Lehman, Love, Ruth, Shetty, Stewart, Terrasa, Williams, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 722
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing certain individuals to petition a court to remove from public inspection certain records relating to an action for repossession of residential property for failure to pay rent; establishing certain procedures and requirements for the consideration of a petition to shield records under the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {643620/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-38)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-1)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 722
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Shielding of Court Records
House 2/16/2022 2/16/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Favorable with Amendments {643620/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Shielding of Court Records
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (92-38) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Second Reading Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (40-1) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 722
Text - Chapter - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Shielding of Court Records
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:19 PM
Click to return on the top page