Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Employment Discrimination - Use of Cannabis Products
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, Toles, Boafo, Fennell, Jackson, and Turner
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an employer from discriminating against an individual because of the individual's use of cannabis products under certain circumstances; establishing that certain provisions prohibiting employment discrimination do not prohibit an employer from taking certain actions against an employee under certain circumstances or authorize certain behaviors by an employee; and requiring certain employers to issue a drug policy under certain circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0513
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Employment Discrimination - Use of Cannabis Products
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Employment Discrimination - Use of Cannabis Products
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:00 PM
Click to return on the top page