Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Licenses and Stamps - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Hornberger
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to make available and, on request, issue certain licenses and stamps in a digital or electronic format; establishing that an individual may satisfy certain requirements to possess or display a license or stamp by possessing or displaying the document in a digital or electronic format as provided by the Department, subject to a certain exception; requiring an annual special Chesapeake Bay and coastal sport fishing license to be permanently affixed to a boat; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {330818/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Licenses and Stamps - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {634636/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources - Licenses and Stamps - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - Licenses and Stamps - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natural Resources – Licenses, Permits, Registrations, and Certificates – Digital or Electronic Format
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {330818/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Licenses and Stamps - Revisions
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments {634636/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources - Licenses and Stamps - Revisions
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - Licenses and Stamps - Revisions
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:27 PM
Click to return on the top page