Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Handgun Permits - Accidental Discharge and Training Requirements - Maryland State Police Gun Center (Firearm Safety Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
Delegate Williams
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a person who holds a handgun permit and accidentally discharges a firearm to register within 90 days for a certain firearms safety training course and complete the course within 6 months of the incident; requiring the Secretary of State Police to revoke a handgun permit of a certain person who fails to successfully complete a certain firearms safety training course; requiring the Secretary to provide certain written notice to a person whose handgun permit is revoked; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0324
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2025
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2024
Legislative Date
2/21/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2024
Legislative Date
2/21/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Handgun Permits - Accidental Discharge and Training Requirements - Maryland State Police Gun Center (Firearm Safety Act of 2024)
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2024 2/21/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/21/2024 2/21/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/22/2024 1:24 PM
Click to return on the top page