Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training (Healing Maryland's Trauma Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate R. Lewis
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 722
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Trauma-Informed Care to coordinate a statewide initiative to prioritize the trauma-responsive and trauma-informed delivery of State services that impact children, youth, families, and older adults; requiring the Commission to submit its findings annually to the Governor and the General Assembly by June 30; requiring the Commission to study developing a process and framework for implementing an Adverse Childhood Experiences (ACEs) Aware Program in the State; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0299
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {556789/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 722
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments {556789/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training (Healing Maryland's Trauma Act)
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Referred Rules 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Rereferred to Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/30/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 722
(   8-1301 through 8-1310 )
Last Updated: 6/2/2021 5:39 PM
Click to return on the top page