Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Automated Enforcement Citations and Notices - Mailing Addresses
Sponsored by
Delegate Boyce
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that citations and notices issued as a result of automated enforcement under the Maryland Vehicle Law be sent to the current mailing address on file with the Administration or if a mailing address is not available, the current residential address on file with the Administration.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0672
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Automated Enforcement Citations and Notices - Mailing Addresses
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Favorable Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Second Reading Passed 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Automated Enforcement Citations and Notices - Mailing Addresses
House 2/29/2024 2/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2024 2/20/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/1/2024 3:05 PM
Click to return on the top page