Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsored by
Delegate Long
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a prohibition on the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore County from issuing a Class D beer, wine, and liquor license for use by a drugstore in Baltimore County.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {173092/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Baltimore County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Favorable with Amendments {173092/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Text - Chapter - Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:28 PM
Click to return on the top page