Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilson and Atterbeary
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the Alcohol and Tobacco Commission to be the Alcohol, Tobacco, and Cannabis Commission; establishing a regulatory and licensing system for adult-use cannabis; imposing the sales and use tax on the sale of adult-use cannabis at certain rates in certain fiscal years; establishing the Cannabis Regulation and Enforcement Division as an independent unit in the Commission; requiring the Division, by July 1, 2023, to convert medical cannabis licenses to licenses to operate a medical and adult-use cannabis business; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0516
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/03/2023
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cannabis Reform
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/03/2023
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/01/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {763824/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/01/2023
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2023
Legislative Date
3/02/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {693525/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (37-99)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2023
Legislative Date
3/02/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {983724/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (37-100)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2023
Legislative Date
3/02/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {653821/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (38-100)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2023
Legislative Date
3/02/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {873425/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (36-99)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2023
Legislative Date
3/02/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {593320/1 (Delegate Mangione) Rejected (37-98)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2023
Legislative Date
3/02/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {123728/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (38-98)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2023
Legislative Date
3/02/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Cannabis Reform
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-32)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Referred Finance Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2023 2/03/2023 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Cannabis Reform
House 2/03/2023 2/03/2023 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2023 3/06/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2023 3/01/2023 Favorable with Amendments {763824/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2023 3/01/2023 Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2023 3/02/2023 Floor Amendment {693525/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (37-99) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2023 3/02/2023 Floor Amendment {983724/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (37-100) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2023 3/02/2023 Floor Amendment {653821/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (38-100) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2023 3/02/2023 Floor Amendment {873425/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (36-99) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2023 3/02/2023 Floor Amendment {593320/1 (Delegate Mangione) Rejected (37-98) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2023 3/02/2023 Floor Amendment {123728/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (38-98) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2023 3/02/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Cannabis Reform
House 3/10/2023 3/04/2023 Third Reading Passed (103-32) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2023 3/04/2023 Referred Finance Budget and Taxation 41AClick to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/22/2023 11:37 AM
Click to return on the top page