Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Probation Before Judgment - Probation Agreements - Probation Not Deportation
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Fisher, Cardin, Charkoudian, Feldmark, Foley, Healey, J. Lewis, Palakovich Carr, Stewart, Washington, and Williams
Status
In the Senate - Special Order until next session (Senator Ready) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to stay the entering of judgment, defer further proceedings, and place a certain defendant on probation subject to reasonable conditions if the court finds facts justifying a finding of guilt; authorizing the court and a certain defendant to enter into a probation agreement under certain circumstances; providing that the entry of a probation agreement under the Act shall be considered as a probation before judgment for all other purposes under State law; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0265
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {313221/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Hornberger) Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {373528/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (40-86)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-41)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {163028/1 Adopted
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Probation Before Judgment - Probation Agreements - Probation Not Deportation
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments {313221/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Hornberger) Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Floor Amendment {373528/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (40-86) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Probation Before Judgment - Probation Agreements - Probation Not Deportation
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Third Reading Passed (87-41) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments {163028/1 Adopted 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Ready) Adopted 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:20 PM
Click to return on the top page