Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status
Sponsored by
Delegate Fennell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the housing policy of the State to include providing for fair housing to all citizens regardless of reentry-into-society status; prohibiting a person from refusing to sell or rent a dwelling to any person because of reentry-into-society status; prohibiting a person from discriminating against any person in the terms, conditions, or privileges of the sale or rental of a dwelling because of reentry-into-society status; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0106 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/08/2021 3/08/2021 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 3:35 PM
Click to return on the top page