Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Allen, Alston, Amprey, Bagnall, Bartlett, Bhandari, Bouchat, Boyce, Crutchfield, Ebersole, Edelson, Fennell, Foley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Grossman, Guyton, Harris, Henson, Hill, Hornberger, Jackson, A. Johnson, S. Johnson, D. Jones, Kaiser, Kaufman, Lopez, Love, Mireku-North, Munoz, Palakovich Carr, Pasteur, Patterson, Phillips, Roberson, Roberts, Ruff, Ruth, Simmons, Simpson, Solomon, Spiegel, Stewart, Taveras, Taylor, Toles, Turner, Valderrama, Watson, Williams, and Ziegler
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Racial Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Altering the composition of the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board; altering certain duties, powers, and procedures for the Board to make awards to victims of crime; altering the powers and duties of certain employees; altering the amount and types of awards the Board is authorized to make to certain victims of crime; authorizing reconsideration and judicial review of decisions of the Board; authorizing the Governor to include certain funding in the annual budget bill for the Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0471
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024, July 1, 2025
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {903428/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Pippy) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-4)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024)
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments {903428/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Pippy) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/06/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024)
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (131-4) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 4:10 PM
Click to return on the top page