Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dorchester County - County Applicants - Polygraph Examination
Sponsored by
Dorchester County Delegation
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting applicants for employment as a paramedic or an emergency medical technician with Dorchester County, as a 9-1-1 Center dispatcher at the Dorchester County 9-1-1 Center, or as a correctional officer of the Dorchester County Detention Center from the prohibition on employers requiring or demanding that an individual submit to or take a polygraph examination as a condition of prospective employment.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0809
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1270 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Dorchester County - County Applicants - Polygraph Examination
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Dorchester County - County Applicants - Polygraph Examination
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983820/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {343826/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-2)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Dorchester County - County Applicants - Polygraph Examination
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Dorchester County - County Applicants - Polygraph Examination
House 2/10/2024 2/10/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Dorchester County - County Applicants - Polygraph Examination
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Finance 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable with Amendments {983820/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Floor Amendment {343826/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (45-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (130-2) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Dorchester County - County Applicants - Polygraph Examination
Last Updated: 4/12/2024 7:53 AM
Click to return on the top page