Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Retaliation by Employer - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Davis
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding a provision of law prohibiting an employer from discharging a covered employee who files a claim for workers' compensation to include prohibiting the employer from retaliating in any way against the covered employee; applying a specified criminal penalty to a violation of the Act; authorizing a covered employee aggrieved by a specified violation to bring a civil action against the employer; authorizing a court to grant specified relief if the trier of fact in a specified action finds in favor of the employee; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0609
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2013 3/23/2013 Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page