Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Employment Discrimination – Sexual Orientation
Sponsored by
The Speaker and Delegate Clippinger
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain provisions of law prohibiting employment discrimination on the basis of sex and gender identity to also prohibit employment discrimination on the basis of sexual orientation.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Employment Discrimination – Sexual Orientation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Employment Discrimination – Sexual Orientation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Employment Discrimination – Sexual Orientation
House 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 36BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Employment Discrimination – Sexual Orientation
House 3/07/2024 2/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Referred Finance 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Second Reading Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 4:10 PM
Click to return on the top page