Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Trauma Fund - State Primary Adult Resource Center - Reimbursement of On-Call and Standby Costs
Sponsored by
Delegates McIntosh and Busch
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the purpose of the Maryland Trauma Physician Services Fund to include subsidizing the documented costs incurred by the State primary adult resource center to maintain certain on-call and standby health care providers; and requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to develop certain guidelines for the reimbursement of certain costs.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0901
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Trauma Fund - State Primary Adult Resource Center - Reimbursement of On-Call and Standby Costs
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Trauma Fund - State Primary Adult Resource Center - Reimbursement of On-Call and Standby Costs
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Text - Chapter - Maryland Trauma Fund - State Primary Adult Resource Center - Reimbursement of On-Call and Standby Costs
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page