Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Judges' Retirement System - Retiree Health Benefits - Mandatory Retirement
Sponsored by
Health and Government Operations Committee
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the eligibility for State retiree health benefits for a retiree of the Judges' Retirement System and the retiree's spouse and dependent children when a retiree of the Judges' Retirement System retired at a mandatory retirement age with less than 5 years of creditable service; and providing for the calculation of a certain State subsidy.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {776280/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Wilkins) Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (40-91)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-48)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - State Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Requirements for Selection of Pharmacy Benefits Manager
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments {776280/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Wilkins) Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (40-91) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Judges' Retirement System - Retiree Health Benefits - Mandatory Retirement
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (87-48) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Referred Rules 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Favorable Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Second Reading Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Returned Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/21/2021 1:29 PM
Click to return on the top page