Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals
Sponsored by
Delegate Hill
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from conducting or contracting for animal testing in the development of a cosmetic; prohibiting a manufacturer from selling or offering for sale in the State a cosmetic under certain circumstances beginning July 1, 2022; providing that certain provisions of the Act do not apply to certain animal testing; prohibiting a political subdivision from adopting or enforcing provisions of local law relating to animal testing on cosmetics; establishing certain penalties for certain violations of the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0282
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-39)
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2021 3/15/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Third Reading Passed (95-39) 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Finance 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Returned Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:43 PM
Click to return on the top page