Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Medical Cannabis – Compensation and Benefits
Sponsored by
Delegates Valderrama and Charkoudian
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a covered employee or a dependent of a covered employee is not entitled to compensation or benefits under the workers' compensation law to include circumstances related to the use of medical cannabis; including medical cannabis in the medicine that an employer or its insurer is required to provide to a covered employee except under certain circumstances; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0683 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 12:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Workers’ Compensation – Medical Cannabis – Compensation and Benefits
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 12:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 3/15/2022 1:00 PM
Click to return on the top page