Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
Sponsored by
Delegates Healey and Holmes
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering procedures for the dispute settlement mechanism under the Maryland Cooperative Housing Corporation Act; specifying that the dispute settlement mechanism does not apply to complaints or demands arising out of a cooperative housing member's failure to pay certain assessments; repealing a prohibition on the governing body of a cooperative housing corporation bringing an action in court to evict a member based solely on the member's failure to pay assessments under certain circumstances; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0825 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {623022/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
House 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {623022/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:21 PM
Click to return on the top page