Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Boards of Education – Student Member – Voting
Sponsored by
Delegate Novotny
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting student members of a county board of education from casting a deciding vote on issues before the county board.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - County Boards of Education – Student Member – Voting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2021
Legislative Date
1/23/2021
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - County Boards of Education – Student Member – Voting
House 1/23/2021 1/23/2021 Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
(   3-106 )
Last Updated: 2/13/2021 4:21 PM
Click to return on the top page