Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsored by
Allegany County Delegation and Garrett County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering to 50 yards from a dwelling house, residence, church, or any other building or camp occupied by human beings the size of the safety zone for archery hunters in Allegany County and Garrett County within which archery hunting may not take place except under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0453
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-2)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
House 3/04/2021 3/04/2021 Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-2) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Returned Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Text - Chapter - Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:26 PM
Click to return on the top page