Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Healthy Working Families Act - Application
Sponsored by
Delegate Carey
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the exemption from the application of the Healthy Working Families Act for employees employed in the construction industry; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0653 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Healthy Working Families Act - Application
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Healthy Working Families Act - Application
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 12:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:22 PM
Click to return on the top page