Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Actual Income
Sponsored by
Delegates Crutchfield, Korman, Love, and Wolek
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "actual income" to include certain amounts of nontaxable, earned income from an employer, the amount of federal, State, and local, taxes, including Medicare taxes and any amount required to be withheld under the Federal Insurance Contributions Act, that would have been withheld if the income were taxable for purposes of child support calculations.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0390
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Child Support - Actual Income
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {493120/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Child Support - Actual Income
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Family Law - Child Support - Actual Income
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing canceled
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/12/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Favorable with Amendments {493120/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Family Law - Child Support - Actual Income
House 3/14/2024 3/04/2024 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:04 PM
Click to return on the top page