Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Care Programs – Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program – Information and Assistance
Sponsored by
Delegates Guyton, Griffith, Henson, Howell, Terrasa, and Williams
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a child care program to provide to parents or guardians of a child under the age of 3 years information about the Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program and contact information for the local agency responsible for administering the Program; requiring a child care program to assist a parent or guardian with scheduling a time and location for the administering agency of the Program to provide a certain screening; and requiring the State Department of Education to provide certain information to child care programs.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873428/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Child Care Programs – Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program – Information and Assistance
House 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments {873428/1 Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Child Care Programs – Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program – Information and Assistance
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Text - Chapter - Child Care Programs – Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program – Information and Assistance
Age
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:23 PM
Click to return on the top page