Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Contract Liens - Medical Debt
Sponsored by
Delegates Embry, Attar, Boafo, Charkoudian, Conaway, Crutchfield, Feldmark, Henson, Palakovich Carr, Pasteur, Terrasa, Pena-Melnyk, Cullison, Alston, Bagnall, Bhandari, Chisholm, Hill, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, Rosenberg, Taveras, White Holland, and Woods
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the creation of a lien on owner-occupied residential property by contract or as a result of a breach of contract for the payment of medical debt.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0630
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Contract Liens - Medical Debt
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {223025/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Real Property - Contract Liens - Medical Debt
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Real Property - Contract Liens - Medical Debt
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments {223025/1 Adopted 36BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Real Property - Contract Liens - Medical Debt
House 3/07/2024 2/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:05 PM
Click to return on the top page