Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Stay of Eviction Proceeding for Rental Assistance Determination
Sponsored by
Delegates Stewart, Amprey, Charkoudian, Cullison, D. Jones, Lehman, Lierman, Love, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Ruth, Shetty, and Solomon
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing for the stay of certain eviction proceedings when a tenant is waiting for a determination on a good faith application for rental assistance.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0384
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {483421/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (84-35)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant – Stay of Eviction Proceeding for Rental Assistance Determination
House 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {483421/1 Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant - Stay of Eviction Proceeding for Rental Assistance Determination
House 4/04/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (84-35) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Referred Rules 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:23 PM
Click to return on the top page