Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Security Systems Technicians - Applicants - Authority to Practice
Sponsored by
Delegate Jackson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that an applicant for registration to provide security systems services may provide security system services and have access to circumventional information if the applicant applied for registration, received an application number confirming receipt, and the application was not rejected by the Secretary of Labor.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0713
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Security Systems Technicians - Applicants - Authority to Practice
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Security Systems Technicians - Applicants - Authority to Practice
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Security Systems Technicians - Applicants - Authority to Practice
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 36BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Security Systems Technicians - Applicants - Authority to Practice
House 3/07/2024 2/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:05 PM
Click to return on the top page