Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Nuclear Power Plants - Emergency Preparedness (Radiation and Emergency Preparedness and Protection Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates T. Morgan and J. Long
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Radiation Emergency Response Program in the Department of the Environment; requiring the Department to serve as an offsite response organization and the lead State agency for all nuclear incidents within the State; requiring the Department to prepare a technical emergency radiation response plan, respond to emergencies involving a nuclear power plant, participate in a certain federal program, and procure certain specialized equipment; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0536
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-7)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Environment - Nuclear Power Plants - Emergency Preparedness (Radiation and Emergency Preparedness and Protection Act)
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Favorable Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment - Nuclear Power Plants - Emergency Preparedness (Radiation and Emergency Preparedness and Protection Act)
House 3/14/2024 3/04/2024 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Second Reading Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (40-7) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
(   8-101,   8-102,   8-701 through 8-704 )
Last Updated: 4/12/2024 4:47 PM
Click to return on the top page