Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools – Health and Safety – Carbon Dioxide Monitoring in Classrooms (Safe School Indoor Air Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Solomon, Boyce, Carr, Charles, Forbes, Fraser-Hidalgo, Kelly, Lehman, Love, Luedtke, Palakovich Carr, Ruth, Shetty, Stewart, Terrasa, Valentino-Smith, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Safe School Indoor Air Program in the Maryland Department of the Environment to improve indoor air quality in public school classrooms; requiring the Department, in consultation with the Maryland State Department of Education, to administer the Program; requiring public schools to monitor carbon dioxide levels in each classroom in a school at least twice each school year; requiring certain remediation measures; and requiring each county board of education to develop a certain policy and implementation plan.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Text - First - Public Schools – Health and Safety – Carbon Dioxide Monitoring in Classrooms (Safe School Indoor Air Act)
House 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
(   2-1601 through 2-1607 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:23 PM
Click to return on the top page