Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Second Degree Assault - Sports Official
Sponsored by
Delegate McComas
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from intentionally causing physical injury to another if the person knows or has reason to know that the other is an official, an umpire, a referee, or a judge officiating at a sporting event; authorizing a police officer to arrest a person without a warrant if the police officer has probable cause to believe that the person has committed a certain assault; and establishing that a violation of the Act is a misdemeanor with a penalty of up to 10 years in prison or a fine of up to $2,500 or both.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0028
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Second Degree Assault - Sports Official
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Second Degree Assault - Sports Official
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:45 PM
Click to return on the top page