Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Governor's Office for Children - Engaging Neighborhoods, Organizations, Unions, Governments, and Households (ENOUGH) Grant Program (ENOUGH Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Allen, Amprey, Anderton, Bagnall, Bartlett, Bhandari, Boafo, Bouchat, Boyce, Charkoudian, Conaway, Crutchfield, Ebersole, Edelson, Fennell, Foley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Grossman, Guyton, Harris, Henson, Hill, Hornberger, Ivey, Jackson, A. Johnson, S. Johnson, D. Jones, Kaiser, Kaufman, Love, McCaskill, Palakovich Carr, Pasteur, Patterson, Phillips, Pruski, Qi, Roberson, Rogers, Ruff, Ruth, Simmons, Simpson, Solomon, Spiegel, Stewart, Taveras, Taylor, Toles, Turner, Valderrama, Watson, White Holland, and Williams
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Governor's Office for Children and the Special Secretary of the Governor's Office for Children as the head of the Office; requiring the Special Secretary to establish the ENOUGH grant program, subject to certain requirements; requiring the Office to assign certain staff for a certain purpose; establishing certain reporting and evaluation requirements; establishing the ENOUGH Grant Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; requiring the Governor to appropriate $15,000,000 to the fund for fiscal year 2026; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0482
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Governor's Office for Children - Engaging Neighborhoods, Organizations, Unions, Governments, and Households (ENOUGH) Grant Program (ENOUGH Act of 2024)
House 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 2/27/2024 2/27/2024 Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
House 2/27/2024 2/27/2024 Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
(   9-2801 through 9-2805 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:06 PM
Click to return on the top page