Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Education - Report on Low-Achieving Students
Sponsored by
Delegate Cluster
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Baltimore County Superintendent of Schools to submit a specified report on the number of students in specified grades for each Baltimore County public school with less than a specified grade point average and the programs that have been established to reduce the number of students with a low grade point average to the Baltimore County Board of Education, the Baltimore County Council, and the Baltimore County Delegation of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2014; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page