Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Breakfast and Lunch Programs - Universal Expansion
Sponsored by
Delegates Palakovich Carr, Allen, Attar, Atterbeary, Bagnall, Bartlett, Boafo, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Cullison, Ebersole, Embry, Fair, Feldmark, Foley, Forbes, Fraser-Hidalgo, Grossman, Guyton, Guzzone, Harris, Healey, Henson, Hill, Holmes, D. Jones, Kaufman, Kerr, Lehman, R. Lewis, J. Long, Lopez, Love, McCaskill, Metzgar, Mireku-North, Pasteur, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Qi, Rogers, Rosenberg, Ruth, Shetty, Simmons, Simpson, Solomon, Spiegel, Stein, Stewart, Taveras, Terrasa, Turner, Vogel, Wells, White Holland, Wilkins, Williams, Wims, Wolek, Wu, and Ziegler
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the standards of the State Free Feeding Program, beginning in fiscal year 2025, to require that if a school participates in the federal School Breakfast Program or the National School Lunch Program, then each student in the school must be offered a meal at no cost to the student; providing for the reimbursement rate at which the State shall pay county boards and participating nonpublic schools for the meals offered to students; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0579
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0628 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024, July 1, 2025
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education - Breakfast and Lunch Programs - Universal Expansion
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/16/2024 11:53 AM
Click to return on the top page