Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of the Person of a Disabled Person - Expedited Proceedings
Sponsored by
Delegates Bartlett and Pena-Melnyk
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a court to rule on petitions to appoint a guardian of the person of a disabled person in order to seek transfer or discharge of a disabled person from a hospital within 10 days; and requiring that hearings to appoint a guardian of the person of a disabled person be held virtually unless the party seeking appointment requests that the hearing be held in person.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0759
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2024
Legislative Date
1/30/2024
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of the Person of a Disabled Person - Expedited Proceedings
House 1/30/2024 1/30/2024 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/12/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:06 PM
Click to return on the top page