Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Virtual Meetings
Sponsored by
Delegate Terrasa
Status
In the House - Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a person conducting a meeting of a cooperative housing corporation, condominium, or homeowners association by telephone conference, video conference, or similar electronic means to provide a participant a reasonable opportunity to participate in the meeting; requiring certain participants in a meeting of a cooperative housing corporation, condominium, or homeowners association to have equal access to any available chat function; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0331 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Virtual Meetings
House 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Last Updated: 2/23/2024 6:30 PM
Click to return on the top page