Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Donations to Diaper Banks and Other Charitable Entities
Sponsored by
Delegate D. Jones
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction under the Maryland income tax for up to $1,000 of donations of certain disposable diapers, certain hygiene products, and certain monetary gifts made by a taxpayer during the taxable year to certain qualified charitable entities; requiring the taxpayer to file certain information with the taxpayer's income tax return in order to claim the subtraction; requiring the Comptroller to adopt certain regulations and report to the General Assembly; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0622
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {315269/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Donations to Diaper Banks and Other Charitable Entities
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {315269/1 Adopted 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Donations to Diaper Banks and Other Charitable Entities
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 2:00 PM
Click to return on the top page