Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Intended Use Plans and Privately Owned Wastewater Facilities
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to provide a certain intended use plan to the General Assembly within 5 days after a plan's publication for public comment; altering the definition of "privately owned wastewater facility" as it relates to the awarding of grants from the Bay Restoration Fund; requiring the Department to report on or provide certain information regarding funding for privately owned wastewater facilities to the General Assembly and the Department of Budget and Management; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0354
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {243323/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {853424/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {293421/1 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-4)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Bay Restoration Fund - Intended Use Plans and Privately Owned Wastewater Facilities
House 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {243323/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Bay Restoration Fund - Intended Use Plans and Privately Owned Wastewater Facilities
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {853424/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Floor Amendment {293421/1 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (44-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-4) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Bay Restoration Fund - Intended Use Plans and Privately Owned Wastewater Facilities
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Text - Chapter - Bay Restoration Fund - Intended Use Plans and Privately Owned Wastewater Facilities
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:12 PM
Click to return on the top page