Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs - Location and Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate Guyton
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 389
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Moving the State Coordinator for Autism Strategy to the Governor's Office of Community Initiatives; and requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill, for fiscal year 2023 and each fiscal year thereafter, an appropriation to fund the position of State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and the Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2021
Legislative Date
2/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {364960/1
Proceedings
17BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
Proceedings
17BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {364960/1 Adopted
Proceedings
17BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 389
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs - Mandated Appropriation
House 2/06/2021 2/06/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/02/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {364960/1 17BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 2/26/2021 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 17BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {364960/1 Adopted 17BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 2/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs - Location and Funding
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Referred Finance 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Returned Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 389
Text - Chapter - State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs - Location and Funding
Last Updated: 7/26/2021 6:56 AM
Click to return on the top page