Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Employment of Minors - Opportunities for Work
Sponsored by
Delegate Queen
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry, subject to a certain limitation, to release certain personal information of a minor who is at least 16 years old and has a work permit to employers and apprenticeship sponsors, educational programs and institutions, and local workforce development boards that have requested and have registered with the Department for the purpose of receiving the information.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0420
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Employment of Minors - Work Permits - Information Sharing
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {663229/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Employment of Minors - Opportunities for Work
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-29)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Employment of Minors - Work Permits - Information Sharing
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments {663229/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Employment of Minors - Opportunities for Work
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (106-29) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Referred Rules 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/14/2022 9:32 AM
Click to return on the top page