Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Prohibitions on Former Employees and Commissioners
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, D.E. Davis, W. Fisher, Ghrist, Holmes, Jalisi, Jones, Luedtke, Malone, Saab, Shetty, Sydnor, and Wells
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting former employees of the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission and former commissioners of the Commission from being an owner or an employee of any business entity that holds a license under Title 13, Subtitle 33 of the Health - General Article or from having an official relationship with those business entities for the 1-year period immediately after the former employee is no longer employed by the Commission or the former commissioner is no longer serving as a commissioner.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0552
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Prohibitions on Former Employees and Commissioners
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   13-3305.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page